Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00836
Date Filed2017-05-05
Date Closed2017-08-10
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted multiple FOIA requests to the Air Force, the Marine Corps, and the Secret Service for records concerning travel expenses for members of the Trump administration and family, as well as the cost of travel by former President Obama to Hawaii. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Office of the General Counsel
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-051COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4942325) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Defense, # 5 Summons Department of Homeland Security)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-093SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-114ERRATA Corrected Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1 by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/15/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/14/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/15/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-186NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-06-137Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' Response to the Complaint shall be filed on or before June 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/14/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 6/21/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-218ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-219ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 5, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/21/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/5/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-0510Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before July 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/06/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent status report on or before September 1, 2017, unless the parties before that date file a stipulation of dismissal or advise the court that summary judgment will be necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/18/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines : Parties' Joint Status Report due by 9/1/17. (kk) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-0912STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff