Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00838
Date Filed2017-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Geological Survey for records concerning tracking data on whooping cranes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told the Center that it might not be able to respond for another two years. The Center for Biological Diversity then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-051COMPLAINT against U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4942576) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to U.S. Geological Survey, # 3 Summons to U.S Attorney, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-052Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-103ERRATA Regarding Corrected Complaint by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 CORRECTED Complaint)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-11Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sb) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-114SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-115ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 11, 2017. (NS) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-06-266Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 6 Consent Motion for An Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint, which requests an extension of the time to answer in this action so the parties may pursue a potential settlement of the matter. For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. The deadline for filing an answer in this action is JULY 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/30/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/26/2017. (dot) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-267Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. GEOLOGICAL SURVEY (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 7 Consent Motion for An Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint, which requests an extension of the time to answer in this action so the parties may pursue a potential settlement of the matter. This request was filed on the day the answer was due, and consequently violated this Court's standing order which requires such requests to be filed 4 business day before the first affected deadline. Nonetheless, for good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. The deadline for filing an answer in this action is AUGUST 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/27/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-258NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-289ORDER. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/28/2017. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff