Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGoldner v Social Security Administration
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2017cv01243
Date Filed2017-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James K. Bredar
PlaintiffEd Goldner
Case DescriptionEd Goldner submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for a list of individuals and businesses who were representing clients in social security disability claim cases. He indicated that he was not seeking private or home address information for anyone. The agency acknowledged receipt of Goldner's request, but denied it on the basis that he was seeking personal information about others included in the records. Goldner filed an administrative appeal. The agency provided some contact information for businesses, but withheld other identifying information. Goldner then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSocial Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6647951.), filed by Ed Goldner. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Awkward, George) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-082QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint filed by Ed Goldner. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons for the Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for Maryland. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 Complaint. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-083NOTICE by Ed Goldner re 1 Complaint Summons to (Awkward, George) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-084NOTICE by Ed Goldner Summons (Awkward, George) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-085Summons Issued 60 days as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-186MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Vincent O. Chadick (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6671656.) by Ed Goldner(Awkward, George) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-227PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vincent O Chadick. Directing attorney Vincent O Chadick to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-08-088ORDER directing plaintiff shall show cause within 14 days of this order why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/8/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-099Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-1110PAPERLESS ORDER granting 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint . Answer due 10/10/17. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/11/2017. (vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-2211RESPONSE re 8 Order to Show Cause filed by Ed Goldner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Service)(Chadick, Vincent) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-3012ORDER directing plaintiff shall file his motion to cure service on or before 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/30/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-0813MOTION for Extension of Time to Cure Service by Ed Goldner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of July 6, 2017, # 2 Exhibit Return Receipt of Letter of July 6, 2017)(Chadick, Vincent) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0814Supplemental to 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Cure Service filed by Ed Goldner (Memorandum in Support of Motion) (Chadick, Vincent) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1115PAPERLESS ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall complete service on Attorney General of the United States by 9/22/17. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/11/2017. (vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff