Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPURLING v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00780
Date Filed2017-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffLEO CORNELIUS SPURLING
Case DescriptionLeo Spurling, a state prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a 1988 prison escape in Kentucky in which Spurling was involved. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it had located 1294 pages and that Spurling would need to pay $59 to receive the records. However, the agency and Spurling later got into a dispute about narrowing the scope of his request and he eventually filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDAVID M. HARDY Individually and as Section Chief, Record/Information Dissemination Section
TERMINATED: 04/27/2017
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-04-271COMPLAINT against DAVID M. HARDY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by LEO CORNELIUS SPURLING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) Modified party on 5/8/2017 (td). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-04-272MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LEO CORNELIUS SPURLING (td) Modified on 5/8/2017 (td). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-04-273PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by LEO CORNELIUS SPURLING (td) Modified on 5/8/2017 (td). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-04-274ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $38.96 from Prison Account of Leo Cornelius Spurling and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/26/17. (td) Modified on 5/17/2017 (td). (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-04-275ORDER that this civil action shall proceed under the Freedom of Information Act Against the United Stated Department of Justice. David M. Hardy is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as a party defendant. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/24/17. (See order for further details) (td) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-166SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) (Entered: 05/20/2017)
2017-05-197MOTION to Stay by LEO CORNELIUS SPURLING (jf) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/22/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/22/17 (td) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-319NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-1910ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DAVID M. HARDY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2611ORDER directing defendant, by July 17, 2017, to file an opposition to plaintiff's Motion to Stay These Proceedings During Exhaustion and For Amendment [ECF No. 7] and a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/26/17. (ms) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant' Response due by 7/17/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-0712MOTION to Lift Stay by LEO CORNELIUS SPURLING (jf) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1713RESPONSE re 7 MOTION to Stay and Notice of Exhaustion with Amendment Requesting Lifting of Stay filed by DAVID M. HARDY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1714STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-1915ORDER denying as moot the plaintiff's 7 Motion to Stay and 12 Motion to Lift Stay; directing the defendant to produce records to the plaintiff in three monthly releases on August 21, 2017, September 21, 2017, and October 23, 2017; and ordering the plaintiff to notify the defendants and the Court by November 21, 2017 whether he challenges the defendants' response. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/19/17. (ms) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's submissions due by 11/21/2017 (hs) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff