Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLeigh et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityLas Vegas
Case Number2:2017cv01290
Date Filed2017-05-08
Date Closed2017-05-09
Judge
PlaintiffLaura Leigh
PlaintiffWild Horse Education
Case DescriptionLaura Leigh, the founder of Wild Horse Education, submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management. One request was for records concerning herself. The other request was for records concerning the Fish Creek Herd Management Area investigation. Leigh also requested a fee waiver. The agency responded to her request for records on the Fish Creek Management Area investigation by disclosing 110 pages with redactions. In response to her inquiries, the agency told her the redactions had been made under Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records) and that it was not worth appealing because she would get no more information. As to her request for records about herself, the agency told Leigh that the cost of processing her request would be $898. Leigh then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4599272), filed by Laura Leigh. Proof of service due by 8/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Bureau of Land Management Summons, # 4 Summons Department of the Interior Summons)(Holt, Danielle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-082CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Laura Leigh, Wild Horse Education. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Holt, Danielle) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-09Civil case administratively terminated. Case opened in wrong division by counsel. Case transferred to Northern Division under case number 3:17-00294. Counsel advised to file using this case number for all future filings. (DKJ) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff