Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSea Shepherd Legal v. Department of the Navy
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2017cv00720
Date Filed2017-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S Martinez
PlaintiffSea Shepherd Legal
Case DescriptionSea Shepherd Legal submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning an alleged plan to locate and capture the endangered Vaquita Porpoise in the Gulf of California using Navy-trained porpoises. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sea Shepherd Legal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of the Navy an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [11]
Opinion/Order [14]
Opinion/Order [16]
Opinion/Order [19]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-081COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Department of the Navy (Receipt # 0981-4869136) Attorney Brett Wade Sommermeyer added to party Sea Shepherd Legal(pty:pla), filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett) Modified on 5/10/2017 to accurately describe Attachment #2. (ST) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-082APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas A. Fromherz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4869338 (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-093ORDER re 2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas A Fromherz for Sea Shepherd Legal, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-10Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (ST) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-104Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Department of the Navy; Loretta Lynch; Annette Hayes. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/17/2017. (ST) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-115NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Brett Wade Sommermeyer. Filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) Modified Address on 5/11/2017 (DS). (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-116ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/8/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/15/2017, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-167CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-188SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Department of the Navy on 5/15/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-06-029NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Department of the Navy. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-0610Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Defendant Department of the Navy. Noting Date 6/6/2017, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0811ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/22/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/29/2017, Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-1412ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of the Navy.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-2213Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Defendant Department of the Navy. Noting Date 6/22/2017, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2614JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 13 Second Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time ; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/13/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/20/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 7/27/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-1315Stipulated MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Order , filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. Noting Date 7/13/2017, (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1816STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 15 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-08-1417NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kayla Stahman on behalf of Defendant Department of the Navy. (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1418Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time and Status Update , filed by Defendant Department of the Navy. Noting Date 8/14/2017, (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1419ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time and Status Update signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-10-1620STATUS REPORT and Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant Department of the Navy (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff