Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGRAND CANYON TRUST v. ZINKE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00849
Date Filed2017-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffGRAND CANYON TRUST
Case DescriptionThe Grand Canyon Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning a 2016 Secretarial Order entitled Discretionary Programmatic Environmental Impact Statement to Modernize the Federal Coal Program. The agency disclosed 222 pages and told the Trust that it had located 8,000 potentially responsive records that would be processed and disclosed on a rolling basis. However, the agency subsequently told the Trust that information submitted by two energy companies had been sent out for pre-disclosure notification and that its request was now in the complex queue. The Trust also submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for the records. BLM told the Trust that it would probably take a year to process its request. After several further inquiries were unsuccessful, the Grand Canyon Trust filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantRYAN ZINKE Secretary of the Interior, in his official capacity
DefendantOFFICE OF THE SECRETARY
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-091COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, RYAN ZINKE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4945053) filed by GRAND CANYON TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Bureau of Land Management, # 4 Summons Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons Office of the Secretary, # 6 Summons Ryan Zinke)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GRAND CANYON TRUST (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-093MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric Ames, :Firm- Law Office of Eric Ames, :Address- 3005 South St. Francis Drive, Santa Fe, NM 87505. Phone No. - (575) 741-1231. Fax No. - (970) 797-9133 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4945122. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GRAND CANYON TRUST (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Ames, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-10Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (sb) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-104SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-115STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 11, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Ames. Accordingly, attorney Eric Ames may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 11, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/15/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/14/2017. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/15/17. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-158RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 5/15/2017 (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-159RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY served on 5/15/2017 (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-1510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 5/15/2017 (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-1411ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, RYAN ZINKE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-2812Joint STATUS REPORT in FOIA Case by GRAND CANYON TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, to file another Joint Status Report, by September 29, 2017, informing the Court whether any document production issues remain in dispute and proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 29, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2017. (kt) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-3013NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GRAND CANYON TRUST. Attorney Eric Ames terminated. (Ames, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-09-2914Joint STATUS REPORT (SECOND) by GRAND CANYON TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 27, 2017, a further joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings unless a stipulation of dismissal has been entered by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 2, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2017, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been entered by that date. (tg) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-2715Joint STATUS REPORT by GRAND CANYON TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by December 8, 2017, a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the case and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 27, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2017. (tg) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-12-0816Joint STATUS REPORT by GRAND CANYON TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control further proceedings in this matter: (1) by January 19, 2018, the plaintiff shall file its Motion for Attorney's Fees; (2) by February 16, 2018, the defendants shall file any opposition; (3) by February 28, 2018, the plaintiff shall file any reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 8, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions for Attorney's Fees due by 1/19/2018; Opposition, if any, due by 2/16/2018; Reply due by 2/28/2018. (tg) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff