Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00852
Date Filed2017-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning efforts to supply Sen. Ben Cardin (D-MD) or other members of Congress with information supporting the Obama administration's finding that Russia had tried to influence the 2016 election. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4945447) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/29/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-025NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-276ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-297STANDING FOIA ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/29/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 7/19/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-138Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER. In view of 8 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, the parties are directed to file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of this litigation and whether a briefing schedule is necessary by no later than September 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/14/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-259STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff