Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePesticide Action Network of North America v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv02706
Date Filed2017-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffPesticide Action Network of North America
Case DescriptionThe Pesticide Action Network of North America submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the pesticide chlorpyrifos. After several queries about the status of its requests, the EPA indicated that it did not know when it would be able to respond. PANNA then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
DefendantU.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-101COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Environmental Protection Agency, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-11382672). Filed by Pesticide Action Network of North America. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 5/10/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-102Proposed Summons. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 5/10/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-103Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-124Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2017 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-125Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-246MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Marisa Ordonia ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11418627.) filed by Pesticide Action Network of North America. (Ordonia, Marisa) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-247MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Patti A. Goldman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11418721.) filed by Pesticide Action Network of North America. (Goldman, Patti) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-248ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 6 Pro Hac Vice Application. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-249ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 7 Pro Hac Vice Application. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2410SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pesticide Action Network of North America. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency served on 5/12/2017, answer due 7/11/2017. (Ordonia, Marisa) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-2411CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pesticide Action Network of North America.. (Boyles, Kristen) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-06-0612STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Cocmplaint filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 6/6/2017) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-07-0713Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/7/2017) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-1114CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/25/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1115CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/11/2017) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1116ORDER AS MODIFIED by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 13 Joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017) Modified on 7/11/2017 (mklS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-11Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-1417ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/14/2017) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-08-1718CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference: Notice is given that the Initial Case Management Conference, currently set for 10/16/2017 at 1:30 PM, is continued to 10/23/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-09-2919ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ordonia, Marisa) (Filed on 9/29/2017) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2920NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Joint) (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/29/2017) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0221***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED TO THIS CASE IN ERROR. WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED.***ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, October 12, 2017, at 9:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017) Modified on 10/2/2017 (af, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0222ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, October 12, 2017, at 9:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0223ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/2/2017) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-1124ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference set for Thursday, October 12, 2017, has been RESCHEDULED to Monday, October 16, 2017, at 4:00 PM Pacific time. New call-in information will be provided to parties by separate cover. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-10-1225Joint Status Report and Request to Continue Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-10-1326ORDER granting 25 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 10/13/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff