Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00864
Date Filed2017-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the Department of the Treasury for records concerning the transfer of $400 million in currency to Iran. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4947127) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 5 Summons U.S. Department of the Treasury)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (jd) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-113SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/16/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/15/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/16/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/16/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-06-155ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-166STANDING FOIA ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/16/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 7/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-07-057Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER. In view of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file another joint status report by no later than October 7, 2017 to update the Court on the status of plaintiff's FOIA requests and whether further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/6/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-248STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-10-069Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-10MINUTE ORDER in view of 9 parties' joint status report, the parties are ordered to file another joint status report by no later than December 6, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, the government's responses, and how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff