Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00865
Date Filed2017-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Case DescriptionThe Animal Legal Defense Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the Dietary Guidelines Advisory Committee's 2015 Scientific Report. The agency disclosed 468 pages. The agency withheld 282 pages in full or in part under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). ALDF filed an administrative appeal, but after the agency indicated it would not be able to respond for 6-8 months, ALDF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4947463) filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-132NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/13/2017)
2017-05-153STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-075NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-146Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's motion for an extension of time 6 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and defendant may answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before July 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/15/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/21/2017. (kt) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-07-217MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 4/7/16 Response Letter, # 2 Exhibit B 45 CFR 5.34, # 3 Exhibit C Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-288Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's motion to dismiss on or before August 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/28/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss due by 8/11/2017. (kt) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-029AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 9 , Defendant's Motion To Dismiss the original Complaint 7 is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/2/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-1610ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Related document: 9 Amended Complaint filed by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-17MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on September 19, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/17/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-17Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/19/2017, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-2311Consent MOTION Requesting Authorization for Plaintiff's Counsel's Telephonic Appearance at September 19, 2017 Status Conference Requesting by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-2412Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 12 , the status conference scheduled for September 19, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for November 2, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 25, 2017, explaining their progress in resolving this matter and proposing a briefing schedule if necessary. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Telephonic Appearance at the September 19, 2017 Status Conference 11 is hereby DENIED as moot in light of the fact that the status conference has been rescheduled. Plaintiff's counsel may participate telephonically in the status conference scheduled for November 2, 2017, and should contact the courtroom deputy to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/24/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2017. The Status Conference set for 9/19/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 11/2/2017, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff