Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00900
Date Filed2017-05-12
Date Closed2018-09-26
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
PlaintiffPETER ALDHOUS
PlaintiffCHARLES SEIFE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-151COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4951101) filed by BUZZFEED, INC., CHARLES SEIFE, PETER ALDHOUS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/25/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/24/2017. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to marcia@zeitgeist.law, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In the future, please remember to select the appropriate relief for all entities that have been served. (ztd, ) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/24/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/24/2017 (td) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-126NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-267ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-26MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before July 24, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/26/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-188Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 8 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by September 14, 2017. Plaintiffs' opposition, combined with any cross-motion and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by October 3, 2017. Defendant's reply, combined with any cross-opposition and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by October 24, 2017. And plaintiffs' cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by November 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/19/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-09-149MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hardy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1410MOTION for Leave to File Second Declaration Ex Parte, In Camera re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) Modified event title on 9/15/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-15MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 10 Motion for Leave to File an Ex Parte, In Camera Declaration. "The receipt of in camera affidavits... when necessary, [is] 'part of a trial judge's procedural arsenal.'" Arieff v. U.S. Dep't of Navy, 712 F.2d 1462, 1469 (D.C. Cir. 1983), quoting United States v. Southard, 700 F.2d 1, 11 (1st Cir. 1983). The Court intends to rule on the question of whether continued sealing is appropriate after it has received and reviewed what it is that the defendant seeks to file. See Lykins v. U.S. Dep't of Justice, 725 F.2d 1455, 1465 (D.C. Cir. 1984) (stating that a court considering litigation materials filed in camera "should be certain to make the public record as complete as possible"). The ex parte, in camera declaration shall be delivered to chambers by September 22, 2017, and a redacted declaration shall be filed on the public docket by the same date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/15/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2111NOTICE Of In Camera, Ex Parte Submission by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Redacted)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-10-0312Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by PETER ALDHOUS, BUZZFEED, INC., CHARLES SEIFE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Peter Aldhous, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-0313Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PETER ALDHOUS, BUZZFEED, INC., CHARLES SEIFE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Peter Aldhous, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-2014Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-20MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall file its cross-opposition/reply to plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment by November 21, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its cross-reply by December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/20/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-11-2115Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Hardy Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) Modified on 11/24/2017 to edit linkage (zrdj). (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2116REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment (same as ECF No. 15) filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Hardy Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) Modified on 11/24/2017 correct linkage (zrdj). (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-1517REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PETER ALDHOUS, BUZZFEED, INC., CHARLES SEIFE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Updated Response, # 2 Declaration (Second) of Peter Aldhous, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-2018Unopposed MOTION Leave to File Sur-Reply re 17 Reply to opposition to Motion, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21MINUTE ORDER granting 18 defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file a sur-reply. Defendant may file a sur-reply not to exceed 10 pages by January 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/21/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's sur-reply due by 1/23/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2018-01-2219SURREPLY re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nebeker, William) Modified event title on 1/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-09-2620ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 56 and 58 and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 9 is GRANTED and plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 12 is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/26/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-2621MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/26/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar