Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWitthoft v. Shulkin et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2017cv02680
Date Filed2017-05-09
Date Closed2017-09-05
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffJesse M. Witthoft
Case DescriptionJesse Witthoft submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for his claims file. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Witthoft filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDavid J. Shulkin Secretary of the Department of Veterans Affairs
DefendantMeghan Flanz Interim General Counsel of the Department of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-091COMPLAINT (no process) against Meghan Flanz, David J. Shulkin. Filed byJesse M. Witthoft. Consent/Declination due by 5/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-092MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jesse M. Witthoft. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-093Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2017 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-244PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 4 PER WRONG ATTACHMENT. SEE DOCKET ENTRY 5 INSTEAD. CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 6/7/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/24/2017 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-245CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 6/7/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-06-026CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jesse M. Witthoft. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-167ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk issue summons, and the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, scheduling orders, attachments, and this order upon the defendants. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-198Summons Issued as to Meghan Flanz, David J. Shulkin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Shulkin USMS form, # 2 Flanz USMS form, # 3 Stretch USMS form, # 4 US Attorney General USMS form)(vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-08-109CLERK'S NOTICE: The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 8/16/2017 1:30 PM has been continued to 9/20/2017 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. The joint case management conference statement is due on 9/13/2017. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-09-0510STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss filed by Meghan Flanz, David J. Shulkin. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-0511CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meghan Flanz, David J. Shulkin.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-0512CLERK'S NOTICE: The court has received the Stipulation with proposed Order to Dismiss that was e-filed on 9/5/2017 10 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), no court order is required to dismiss this action. The parties are hereby notified that this matter is terminated. (igS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff