Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCharles v. United States Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons
DistrictMiddle District of Tennessee
CityNashville
Case Number3:2017cv00782
Date Filed2017-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr
PlaintiffMichael Charles
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-021COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons, filed by Michael Charles. (Filing fee not paid. ) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letters)(ab) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-03NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (ab) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-05-112ORDER: The Plaintiff is hereby GRANTED thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order on the docket in which to either pay the civil filing fee of four hundred dollars ($400.00) or submit an Application to proceed in forma pauperis along with a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the previous six month period. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/11/2017. (xc with IFP, Adm Order 93:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff