Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE et al v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00909
Date Filed2017-05-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
PlaintiffFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environmental Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning emails concerning three named employees which referenced certain outside actors and keywords. After the agency failed to respond in six weeks, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-151COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4951983) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE, FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons To Environmental Protection Agency)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-152Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE, FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-314NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-295ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by June 17, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/3/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-066Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Joint 6 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that the case is STAYED until September 20, 2017, and the parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule on or before that date. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/6/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines:( Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/20/2017), Case Stayed until 9/20/17. (nbn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-09-14Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-197Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc to 9/20/2017, 7 Joint Motion to Extend the Stay. It is hereby ORDERED, that this case shall remain stayed until October 11, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED, that the parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/28/2017. (ad) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-28CASE STAYED: This case shall remain stayed until 10/11/2017. (ad) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-108Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-24MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 10/10/2017, that the parties' Motion is GRANTED, and that this case shall remain stayed until October 25, 2017. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, on or before October 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/24/2017. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-259Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-26MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 10/25/2017, that the parties' Motion is GRANTED, and that this case shall remain stayed until November 15, 2017. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/26/2017. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report, and if necessary, a Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/15/2017. (kh) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-1410Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to Continue the Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Motion is GRANTED, and that this case shall remain stayed until November 30, 2017. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/14/2017. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/30/2017. (kh) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-3011Joint MOTION to Continue the Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion to Continue the Stay. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 11/30/17, that the parties' Motion is GRANTED, and that this case shall remain stayed until January 15, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by January 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/4/2017. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff