Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00911
Date Filed2017-05-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
PlaintiffFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environmental Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning emails involving two named employees which referenced certain outside actors and keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4952410) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE, FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Civil Process Clerk of US Attorney, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons to Attorney General)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-152Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE, FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sth) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-06-304ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-01MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 7/28/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/01/2017)
2017-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a joint status report that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order by 7/28/17. (jth) (Entered: 07/02/2017)
2017-07-285Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-30MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 5 , it is hereby ordered that Defendant will complete its production of responsive records, and file its summary judgment motion by November 28, 2017. Plaintiffs' response due December 12, 2017. Defendant's Reply due December 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/30/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/30/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant will complete its production of responsive records, and file its summary judgment motion by 11/28/2017; Plaintiffs' Response is due by 12/12/2017; Defendant's Reply is due by 12/19/2017. (jth) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 11/28/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/12/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/19/2017. (tb) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-11-286Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-11-29MINUTE ORDER: Granting 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant's summary judgment motion due by December 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/29/17. (DJS) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 12/28/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff