Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00912
Date Filed2017-05-15
Date Closed2017-07-21
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffTHE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS
Case DescriptionThe American Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning waivers for its Moving to Work demonstration program. The ASPCA also requested a fee waiver, arguing that disclosure would be in the public interest. The agency denied the ASPCA's request for a fee waiver. The ASPCA filed an administrative appeal of the decision, which was denied. The agency then told the ASPCA that processing its request would cost $7,862. The agency then informed the ASPCA that its request had been closed for non-payment. Based on its understanding of discussions with HUD FOIA staff, the ASPCA submitted a second request for the same records, again asking for a fee waiver. The agency again denied the ASPCA's fee waiver request, a decision that was upheld on appeal. ASCPA then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-151COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4952507) filed by THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-N, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Pan, Grace) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-183STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/18/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-264NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Tucker Evans on behalf of THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (Evans, Philip) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-155NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-156Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 6 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant may file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before July 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/15/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or response to complaint due by 7/26/2017. (kt) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-07-207NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (Evans, Philip) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/20/2017. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff