Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJohnson v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2017cv01612
Date Filed2017-05-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Wilhelmina M. Wright
PlaintiffScott W. Johnson
Case DescriptionScott Johnson, an attorney and online reporter, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning why Mohammed Abdihamid Farah's attorney was invited and then disinvited to an event at the Minneapolis-St. Paul International Airport. Farah was one of several individuals charged with trying to join ISIS. The agency disclosed nine heavily redacted pages. Johnson filed an administrative appeal. The agency remanded Johnson's request for further processing, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantDHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
TERMINATED: 06/26/2017
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-151COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5506409.) filed by Scott W. Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bevilacqua, Theresa) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-152DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//Summons Returned Unexecuted by Scott W. Johnson as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Bevilacqua, Theresa) Modified text on 5/16/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-153DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//Summons Returned Unexecuted by Scott W. Johnson as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (Bevilacqua, Theresa) Modified text on 5/16/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-154DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//Summons Returned Unexecuted by Scott W. Johnson as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Bevilacqua, Theresa) Modified text on 5/16/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-165TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 17-cv-1612 WMW/BRT. (JDF) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-166Summons Issued as to DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (JDF) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-17TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-177SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott W. Johnson. DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties served on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 5/16/2017, answer due 7/17/2017. (Towns, Tiana) Modified text on 5/19/2017 (LPH). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-198NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-149Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Jointly signed by Defendants. (Fuller, David) Modified text on 6/15/2017 (LPH). (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-1410PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Fuller, David) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-1611ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties answer due 6/30/2017; U.S. Customs and Border Protection answer due 6/30/2017; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/16/2017. (lmb) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-2312STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by U.S. Customs and Border Protection. Jointly Signed by Scott W. Johnson. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-2613ORDER FOR DISMISSAL without prejudice OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 06/26/2017. (TJB) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-3014ANSWER to Complaint filed by DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-0515NOTICE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(JDF) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-1916TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Per counsel request, the Pretrial Conference originally set for 8/16/2017 is reset to 08/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-08-1017REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Jointly Signed by Scott W. Johnson.(Fuller, David) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-2218Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Pretrial Conference held on 8/22/2017. A Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JDF) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2519ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2017 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/25/17. (JDF) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2820PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (non-disp) due 11/1/2017. Motions (disp) due by 12/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/28/17. (JDF) Modified text on 8/29/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff