Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00920
Date Filed2017-05-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce, Department of Education, Department of Labor, Department of Treasury, and the Small Business Administration for records concerning communications or meetings between agency personnel and Ivanka Trump. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Treasury told American Oversight that its request was too vague to conduct a search. American Oversight told Treasury that it believed its request was sufficiently specific to allow the agency to conduct a search. After failing to hear anything further from the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
TERMINATED: 06/08/2017
DefendantU.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-171COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4954833) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-193NOTICE of Corrected Summonses for FOIA Matter by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-19Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-194SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-225GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/22/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/23/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/22/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Defendants)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/23/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 5/22/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/22/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 5/22/2017; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/23/2017; U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 5/22/2017; (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 6 TO VIEW.) (ztd) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to cerissa.cafasso@americanoversight.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI on future filings of this type, you must select the options for all parties served. (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-088NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re U.S. Small Business Administration (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-229ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-23MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 7/10/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/23/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. Department of Commerce et al and by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-31MINUTE ORDER: Based on the representations in the parties 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule for disclosure is set in this case: Defendants shall commence production of non-exempt documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests on or before 8/31/2017, and shall continue production of non-exempt documents on a monthly basis until the completion of production. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 9/29/2017, and every sixty days thereafter, informing the Court of the status of Defendants' document productions, and a further joint status report within thirty days after the completion of the document production proposing, if necessary, a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/31/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2017 (gdf) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff