Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00928
Date Filed2017-05-17
Date Closed2017-11-13
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Secret Service for records concerning former President Obama's schedule and activities from January 21 to March 21, 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4955318) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Homeland Security)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-22Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/26/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/26/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/26/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-095NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-266MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-267Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or by August 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/27/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-08-108ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are 1 a complaint and 8 an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/10/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/25/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-259Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-29MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the summary-judgment briefing schedule shall be as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due by 10/5/2017; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion shall be due by 10/31/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its motion and opposition to Plaintiff's motion shall be due by 11/30/17; and Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion shall be due by 12/14/17. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/29/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/5/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/31/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2017.Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion due by 12/14/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-10-0510MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit No. 1, # 3 Exhibit No. 2, # 4 Exhibit No. 3, # 5 Exhibit No. 4, # 6 Exhibit No. 5, # 7 Exhibit No. 6 (Vaughn Index))(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-2611Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Reset Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Reset the Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall now be due by November 14, 2017. Defendant's combined reply and opposition shall now be due by December 14, 2017. Plaintiff's reply shall now be due by December 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/30/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/14/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2017. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/21/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-11-1312STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff