Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00933
Date Filed2017-05-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Communications Commission for records discussing the desirability of a "two-sided market" for broadband internet services. Judicial Watch submitted a second FOIA request for any emails to or from agency personnel and either Tom Powers or David Edelman. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-171COMPLAINT against FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4955793) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons FCC)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/26/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/26/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION served on 5/26/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-135NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-146First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before August 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/19/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 8/10/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-08-097Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/09/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 9/11/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-09-118ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-129ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 3, 2017. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/12/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-0310Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before December 4, 2017, advising the court whether summary judgment briefing will be necessary in this matter and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/05/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-11-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before February 2, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and advises the court whether summary judgment briefing will be necessary and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-05Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff