Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEATON v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00936
Date Filed2017-05-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJOSHUA EATON
Case DescriptionJoshua Eaton, an investigative journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for emails between Sen. Mark Udall and the CIA pertaining to the Panetta Review. After a number of unsuccessful queries, Eaton filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-171COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY under the Freedom of Information Act ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4956135) filed by JOSHUA EATON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Request, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Eaton Publication List, # 4 Exhibit 3 - CIA Initial Acknowledgment, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Communications Log, # 6 Exhibit 5 - CIA First Interim Response, # 7 Exhibit 6 - CIA Second Interim Response, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Eaton Appeal, # 9 Exhibit 8 - CIA Appeal Response, # 10 Summons)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
2017-05-17Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-143RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/30/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/29/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - US Atty Gen)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 5/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - CIA)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-296NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-297ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-30MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before July 28, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/30/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-288STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 8 status report, defendant shall file a further status report by September 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/31/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-09-119STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report by September 25, 2017, to inform the Court whether further proceedings are necessary in this matter, and to propose a briefing schedule, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/12/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-2510Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-26MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by November 13, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross-motion and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by December 13, 2017. Defendant's reply, combined with any cross-opposition and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by January 5, 2018. And plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by January 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/26/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-11-0911Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-14MINUTE ORDER. The Court grants defendant's consent motion for an extension to file its motion for summary judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by November 30, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition (and cross motion, if any, must be supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities) will be due January 2, 2018; defendant's reply (combined with its cross opposition, if necessary) will be due January 23, 2018; and plaintiff's cross reply, if any, will be due February 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-2912Consent MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-01MINUTE ORDER granting 12 defendant's consent motion to stay the summary judgment briefing schedule. Parties shall file a joint status report by January 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/01/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2018-01-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an updated joint status report by February 2, 2018, which should include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/16/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-02-0214Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
2018-02-05MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ordered that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by March 5, 2018. Plaintiff's opposition (and cross motion, if any, supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities) will be due April 5, 2018. Defendant's reply (combined with its cross opposition, if necessary) will be due May 7, 2018. Plaintiff's cross reply, if any, will be due June 7, 2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for summary judgment due by 3/5/2018; Plaintiff's opposition (and cross motion, if any, supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities) due 4/5/2018; Defendant's reply (combined with its cross opposition, if necessary)due 5/7/2018. Plaintiff's cross reply, if any, due 6/7/2018.(kt) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-03-0515MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0516Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Extend Briefing Schedule by JOSHUA EATON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition (and cross motion, if any, supported by the same memorandum of points and authorities) will be due May 17, 2018. Defendant's reply (combined with its cross opposition, if necessary) will be due June 18, 2018. Plaintiff's cross reply, if any, will be due July 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/07/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-04-0917NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of JOSHUA EATON (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1218NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of JOSHUA EATON (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-1919Joint MOTION to Vacate Briefing Schedule by JOSHUA EATON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-20MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby grants the parties' 19 Joint Motion to Vacate the Briefing Schedule. The parties shall file a joint status report by June 18, 2018, if the matter has not been resolved by then. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/20/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff