Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJason Leopold et al v. Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2017cv03747
Date Filed2017-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Consuelo B. Marshall
PlaintiffJason Leopold
PlaintiffBuzzfeed Inc.
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold and BuzzFeed News submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning President Trump's tweets. The FBI told Leopold and BuzzFeed News that their requests were too broad for it to search. Leopold and BuzzFeed News filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy. The National Security Division issued a Glomar response indicating that it could neither confirm nor deny the existence of records. Leopold and BuzzFeed News filed an administrative appeal of the NSD's Glomar response to the Office of Information Policy. Although other components of the Justice Department acknowledged receipt of the requests, Leopold and BuzzFeed News received no substantive response and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Justice Office of the Attorney General
DefendantDepartment of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General
DefendantDepartment of Justice Office of Legal Counsel
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantDepartment of Justice Civil Division
DefendantDepartment of Justice National Security Division
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-181COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19872750 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P) (Attorney Rachel Steinback added to party Buzzfeed Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rachel Steinback added to party Jason Leopold(pty:pla))(Steinback, Rachel) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-182CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold. (Steinback, Rachel) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-183NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Jason Leopold, Buzzfeed Inc., National Broadcasting Company. (Steinback, Rachel) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-184NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-185APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew V. Topic to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19877460) filed by Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold. (Att achments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Letter of Good Standing) (Steinback, Rachel) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-186APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nabiha B. Syed to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19877936) filed by Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold. (Attac hments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Letter of Good Standing) (Steinback, Rachel) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-197STANDING ORDER. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY, IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Honorable Consuelo B Marshall. Both the Court and the attorneys bear the responsibility for the progress of litigation in this Court. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. Fed.R.Civ.P.1. NON COMPLIANCE MAY LEAD TO THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS AND INCLUDING THE STRIKING OF PLEADINGS AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION. (shb) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-228Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Plaintiffs Buzzfeed Inc., Jason Leopold. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Requested for Central Intelligence Agency, # 2 Summons Requested for Department of Justice Office of Deputy Attorney General, # 3 Summons Requested for Department of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons Requested for Department of Justice Civil Division, # 5 Summons Requested for Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 6 Summons Requested for National Security Agency, # 7 Summons Requested for Department of Justice National Security Division, # 8 Summons Requested for Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, # 9 Summons Requested for Office of Director of National Intelligence)(Steinback, Rachel) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-05930 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Central Intelligence Agency. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051030 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Department of Homeland Security. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051130 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Department of Justice Civil Division. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051230 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051330 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant National Security Agency. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051430 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Department of Justice National Security Division. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051530 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051630 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-051830 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to Defendant Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General. (shb) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-2319ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 5 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew V Topic APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Jason Leopold, Buzzfeed Inc, designating Rachel Steinback as local counsel. (shb) Modified on 6/23/2017 (shb). (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-2320ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 6 Non-Resident Attorney Nabiha B. Syed APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Jason Leopond and Buzzfeed Inc, designating Rachel Steinback as local counsel. (shb) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-2721NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Powell on behalf of Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Civil Division, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Attorney Amy Powell added to party Central Intelligence Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Department of Justice Civil Division(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Department of Justice National Security Division(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party National Security Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Powell added to party Office of the Director of National Intelligence(pty:dft))(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-0522STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Civil Division, Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-2023ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Civil Division, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2124NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 23 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.: The correct case number is: 2:17-cv-03747 CBM (JEMx).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2018-04-1325MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS-ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Court's own motion, this case is set for a Scheduling Conference on June 12, 2018 at 9:30 A. M. pursuant to FRCP 16(b). Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Counsel shall file a Rule 26(f) discovery plan no later than 7 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. The Rule 26(f) discovery plan shall contain the following: (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-06-0126JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial N/A, filed by Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Civil Division, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-0127Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Set a Date for a Status Report filed by Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Civil Division, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-0428ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR JUNE 12, 2018 27 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation to Vacate 27 : NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference set for June 12, 2018 is hereby VACATED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a status report on or before July 9, 2018, proposing next steps. (bm) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-07-0929STATUS REPORT jointly filed filed by Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Civil Division, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-2430TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a Joint Status Report no later than September 7, 2018. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-09-0731STATUS REPORT , filed jointly filed by Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice Civil Division, Department of Justice National Security Division, Department of Justice Office of Legal Counsel, Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, Department of Justice Office of the Deputy Attorney General, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1032TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report 31 and ORDERS the parties to file the next Joint Status Report no later than February 28, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar