Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleArtem v. National Security Agency/Central Security Service
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2017cv01363
Date Filed2017-05-18
Date Closed2018-05-01
JudgeJudge Ellen L. Hollander
PlaintiffIgoshev Artem
Case DescriptionIgoshev Artern, a Russian citizen, submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Agency for records about himself. The agency issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Artern indicated that he would appeal that decision, but apparently had not done so at the time he filed his complaint.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Security Agency/Central Security Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [24]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-181COMPLAINT against National Security Agency/Central Security Service, filed by Igoshev Artem. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-182MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Igoshev Artem(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-223ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff IS GRANTED TWENTY-ONE (21) days from the date of this Order to complete the Marshal forms and summons, and provide three service copies of the complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/22/2017 (c/m 5/22/17 cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-304MOTION for Extension of Time by Igoshev Artem(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-195MOTION for consent to service electronic means by Igoshev Artem (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-196MOTION for Summary Judgment by Igoshev Artem(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-207ORDER granting 4 Motion of plaintiff for Extension of Time; granting 5 Motion of plaintiff for Consent to Service electronic means ; denying 6 Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/20/2017. (c/m and emailed 7/20/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-078AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Security Agency/Central Security Service, filed by Igoshev Artem. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-079RESPONSE re 7 Order filed by Igoshev Artem.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0710Summons Issued 60 days as to National Security Agency/Central Security Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-1811SUMMONS Returned Executed by Igoshev Artem. U.S. Attorney served on 8/14/2017, answer due 10/13/2017.(Originals returned to plaintiff by U.S. Mail and email jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2812SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Security Agency/Central Security Service by Igoshev Artem on 8/23/17 (Originals returned to plaintiff by U.S. Mail and email jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-2113Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to otherwise respond by National Security Agency/Central Security Service(Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-2214MARGINAL ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. National Security Agency/Central Security Service answer due 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/22/2017 (c/m 9/22/17 cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2915MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Summary Judgment by National Security Agency/Central Security Service (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David J. Sherman, # 2 Memorandum of Law)(Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2916Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Igoshev Artem (c/m and emailed 9/29/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-1817RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or alternatively for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Igoshev Artem(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-1818RESPONSE in Opposition TO 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Igoshev Artem.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-3019REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by National Security Agency/Central Security Service.(Andersen, Jane) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-1320CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum of Law by Igoshev Artem.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1321NOTICE of Change of Address by Igoshev Artem. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-1322ORDER granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant's 19 Opposition to Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/13/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 11/14/17-das) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-2023REPLY TO RESPONSE re 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Igoshev Artem.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2018-05-0124MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/1/2018. (c/emailed and mailed 5/2/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0125ORDER granting 15 Motion of NSA for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment; Judgment is entered in favor of the NSA. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/1/2018. (c/emailed and mailed 5/2/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff