Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePacker v. US Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityCentral Islip
Case Number2:2017cv03002
Date Filed2017-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Joan M. Azrack
PlaintiffLeslie E Packer Ph.D.
Case DescriptionLeslie Packer, a freelance online journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning data breaches reported to the agency by Aesthetic Dentistry and SSM Healthcare. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Packer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUS Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-181COMPLAINT against US Department of Health and Human Services Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Leslie E Packer. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit) (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-182Summons Issued as to US Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-18FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 22752 (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-05-193In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-314Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 5/31/2017 Re: This letter acknowledges receipt of your civil action(s). Docket number(s) and judge(s) have been assigned. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-07-205NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of US Department of Health and Human Services (aty to be noticed) (Dickman, Mary) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-206First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint on Consent by US Department of Health and Human Services. (Dickman, Mary) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-21ORDER re 6 : The time for the US Department of Health and Human Services to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including August 21, 2017. Counsel for the defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the plaintiff upon receipt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/21/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-217Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint on Consent by US Department of Health and Human Services. (Dickman, Mary) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-22ORDER re 7 The time for the US Department of Health and Human Services to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including September 12, 2017. Counsel for the defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the plaintiff upon receipt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/22/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff