Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00994
Date Filed2017-05-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning communications between the VA Center in Los Angeles and Vet's Advocacy, Inc. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-241COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4963951) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-24Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-254STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached standing order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/25/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/29/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS served on 5/30/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-296ANSWER to Complaint by US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-05MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an initial scheduling conference at 10:00 a.m. on July 28, 2017, in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/5/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-05Set/Reset Hearings: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 7/28/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/28/2017. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28ENTERED IN ERROR.....Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Scheduling Conference held on 7/28/2017. Minute Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) Modified on 7/28/2017 entered in wrong case (kt). (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall inform Plaintiff of Defendant's understanding of the scope of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request on or before August 28, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report containing a proposed schedule for document production or other proceedings on or before September 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/28/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall inform Plaintiff of Defendant's understanding of the scope of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request on or before 8/28/2017; Joint Status Report due by 9/26/2017. (kt) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-09-267Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' representations in the Joint Status Report 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 15, 2017, advising the Court on any remaining issues. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/26/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2017. (kt) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-12-158NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-159Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-1810Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension 9 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The parties' joint status report 10 is deemed timely filed. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/18/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2018. (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-02-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before April 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/16/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2018. (kt) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-04-1312Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before June 15, 2018, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (kt) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-06-1413Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 13 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before August 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/15/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-08-1414Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-10-1515Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar