Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01004
Date Filed2017-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's policy with respect to hunger strikes. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency responded by disclosing 18 pages with redactions. The ACLU filed an administrative appeal. The agency remanded the ACLU's request for further search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-251COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4966019) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Rule 7.1 Certificate)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sb) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-262LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (sb) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/1/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing and Service)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-165NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Takei on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Takei, Carl) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-07-036NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-037ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-058ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 19, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/05/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-189Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-2010VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER OF 9/19/2017...........ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before September 22, 2017; Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before October 23, 2017; Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before November 20, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before December 11, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/20/2017. (lcapm3) Modified on 9/19/2017 (zcdw). (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motiondue by 9/22/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/23/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/20/2017. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 10/23/2017. Response to Cross Motions due by 11/20/2017. Reply to Cross Motions due by 12/11/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2411NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-09-1912Consent MOTION to Vacate 10 Order,, Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Consent Motion to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. The court's order setting the briefing schedule 10 is hereby vacated. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before January 31, 2018, which updates the court as to the status of processing and production of responsive records and proposes a new summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/19/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2018-01-3113Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before February 28, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/31/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/04/2018)
2018-02-2714Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
2018-02-28MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before March 28, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/28/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-02-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2018. (mac) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-2315Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-26MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before April 27, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/26/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/27/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-2716Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before June 15, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/01/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-06-1417Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before July 13, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/15/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before July 13, 2018. (ldc) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-1318Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before August 15, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/16/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-08-1519Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before November 17, 2018, which updates the court as to how the parties propose to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/17/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar