Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSingh v. Federal Aviation Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2017cv00822
Date Filed2017-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard A Jones
PlaintiffKeerut Singh
Case DescriptionKeerut Singh submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning aircraft traffic near his residence. Singh also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of Singh's request, but did not respond to his request for expedited processing or a fee waiver. Singh filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [8]
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [31]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-251COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Federal Aviation Administration (Receipt # SEA084856), filed by Keerut Singh. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Notice of Related Cases, # 4 Email requesting new case)(CDA) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-262NOTICE: Plaintiff Keerut Singh has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-263LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-265Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) Federal Aviation Administration. (CDA) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-306NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:17-cv-00233-JCC, by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-317STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-318MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 6 Notice of Related Case. The Court does not deem the two cases related and will not transfer or consolidate them. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-049AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Civil-Process Clerk on 5/31/2017, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 06/04/2017)
2017-06-0610AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Office of The United States Attorney General on 6/2/2017, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-1511AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Federal Aviation Administration on 6/8/2017, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-3012NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-3013ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Federal Aviation Administration.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-3014ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/11/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/18/2017, Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2017, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-0715MOTION To Forego Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Evidence) Noting Date 7/28/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-13***Deadlines terminated. The deadlines contained in the Court's 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are VACATED. The Court will reinstate some or all of those deadlines if necessary after its ruling on the parties' pending and forthcoming motions. (VE) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-2416RESPONSE, by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration, to 15 MOTION To Forego Summary Judgment . (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2617REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh, TO RESPONSE to 15 MOTION To Forego Summary Judgment (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-1118MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/8/2017, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1119DECLARATION of Kristin B. Johnson filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1120DECLARATION of Douglas Taylor filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1121DECLARATION of Tina Leal filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1122DECLARATION of Jeannette Elkins filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1423NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Berger Johnson on behalf of Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Johnson, Kristin) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-09-0224RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Keerut Singh, to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument Requested. (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 09/02/2017)
2017-09-0625ORDER denying plaintiff's 15 Motion to forego summary judgment signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0826NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tricia S. Boerger on behalf of Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0827REPLY, filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration, TO RESPONSE to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0828MOTION for Leave Of Court To File Surreply , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Noting Date 9/8/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1129MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh. Noting Date 10/6/2017, (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1130DECLARATION of Keerut Singh filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1231ORDER granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave of Court To File Surreply signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1332SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-0233RESPONSE, by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration, to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-0434REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Keerut Singh, TO RESPONSE to 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Singh, Keerut) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff