Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELLIOTT v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01022
Date Filed2017-05-15
Date Closed2018-01-25
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDAMON ELLIOTT
Case DescriptionDamon Elliott submitted a FOIA request to the General Services Administration for records concerning the purchase of property in Beltsville, MD used by the Agriculture Department. After the agency failed to respond, Elliott filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-05-15Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 5/15/2017. (jd) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-151COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION filed by DAMON ELLIOTT.(jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2017: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sth). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-152MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAMON ELLIOTT (jd) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-153PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAMON ELLIOTT (jd) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-05-156NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DAMON ELLIOTT. Case related to Case No. 17cv858. (sth) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-054NOTICE of Change of Address by DAMON ELLIOTT. (sth) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-095ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $2.66 from Prison Account of Damon Elliott and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/9/17. (sth) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (sth) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-217SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-218ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/21/2017. (DM) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-139Judicial Review by DAMON ELLIOTT (jf) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1910NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-08-0712DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAMON ELLIOTT. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(td) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-0911MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Its Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by 8/23/2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/10/17. (ms) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/23/2017. (dot) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1613NOTICE of Change of Address by DAMON ELLIOTT (ztd) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-2214MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-08-2415Order advising plaintiff to respond by 9/29/2017 to the 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/24/17. (ms) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/29/2017. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-1116Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAMON ELLIOTT. (td) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-2117REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2018-01-2418MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/24/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-01-2419ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/24/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff