Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01044
Date Filed2017-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the Trump administration's Executive Order requiring the agency to review and rescind or revise its definition of the scope of waters protected by the Clean Water Act. The Center also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Center's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-011COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4972776) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (js) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(js) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-023Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-274NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/9/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/9/2017. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/16/2017. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/8/2017 (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-058Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-069ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint.Answer due by 8/8/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/17. (lsj) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-08-0810ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-1411ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting motion to dismiss or motion for summary judgment, as appropriate within 30 days of this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/9/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-1512NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Adair Shannon on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Shannon, Ryan) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/16/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-09-0613Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Propose Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings and to Vacate Summary Judgment Filing Deadline by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy). Added MOTION to Vacate on 9/7/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-2914Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Shannon, Ryan) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0915Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Shannon, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
2017-12-1416Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Shannon, Ryan) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2018-01-0217ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to; granting 13 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/17. (nbn) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-0218ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/17. (znbn) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-0219First AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(zrdj) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-2920ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-02-1321Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-04-1822Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-06-1823Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Shannon, Ryan) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-08-1724Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-1925Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Shannon, Ryan) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar