Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCox v. Department of Justice et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2017cv03329
Date Filed2017-06-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Roslynn R. Mauskopf
PlaintiffDouglas Cox
Case DescriptionDouglas Cox, a law library professor at City University of New York Law School, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the FBI, the Department of Defense, the Department of State, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for a copy of the Senate torture report. The Justice Department told Cox that the report was not an agency record. The FBI told Cox that it could not find the report. Cox filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The other agencies failed to respond on time. Cox then filed suit against all the agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantDepartment of State of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [53]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-021COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9575279 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Douglas Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Proposed Summons, # 6 Proposed Summons) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-02Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-022Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-073In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-074This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-07-055SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. Department of Justice served on 6/12/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-056SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) served on 6/12/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-057SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. Department of Defense served on 6/12/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-058SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 6/12/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-059SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Cox. Department of State of the United States served on 6/15/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-1010ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-1111SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 8/18/2017 @ 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ***NOTE: bring the required number of copies of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/11/2017. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-3112AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Douglas Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-1113Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Conference by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1114Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Amended Complaint by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 13 Motion to Continue. The August 18th initial conference is adjourned sine die. A joint status report is due by September 8, 2017.Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/11/2017. (Kelson, Lise) Modified on 8/11/2017 added full ruling text(Kelson, Lise). (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-11ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/11/2017. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1815ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-09-0616NOTICE of Change of Address by Amy Powell (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0817STATUS REPORT , filed jointly by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-11ORDER re 17 . The State Department will file a report by October 6, 2017 , estimating the total time for processing plaintiff's FDIA request. A joint status report and proposal schedule for further proceedings is due by January 12, 2018 . Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/11/2017. (Godoy-Dalmau, Gabriel) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-10-0618STATUS REPORT , filed jointly by Department of State of the United States (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-10ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: re 18 Status Report filed by Department of State of the United States. The Court adheres to its deadline of January 18, 2018, for the filing of a joint updated status report and proposed schedule for further proceedings. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/10/2017. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-12-1819Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and Complete Processing of Responsive Documents Subject to FOIA by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The defense request to extend the existing deadlines is granted, on consent. The joint status report (with a proposed schedule for further proceedings) is now due by April 6, 2018. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/18/2017. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-04-0620STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the plaintiff and defendants by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-06ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER. A further updated joint status report is due by May 11, 2018. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/6/2018. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-05-1121STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the plaintiff and defendants by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14STATUS REPORT ORDER. A further updated joint Status Report is due by 6/12/2018.Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/14/2018. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-1222STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the plaintiff and defendants by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-1323STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the plaintiff and defendants by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1624Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2018. In response to the parties' joint status report of July 13, (DE #23), the Court conducts a telephone conference regarding plaintiff's desire to amend his complaint. See attached Minute Entry. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-08-0325STATUS REPORT , jointly filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-0726AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Douglas Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-0727STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the plaintiff and defendants by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) Modified on 8/8/2018 (Kelson, Lise). (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-08ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Defendants' answer to the Amended Complaint is due by September 7, 2018. By September 21, 2018, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule (docketed as a motion event into the ECF court file). Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/8/2018. (Kelson, Lise) Modified on 8/8/2018 (Kelson, Lise). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-09-0728ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-2129STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the parties by Douglas Cox (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24STATUS REPORT ORDER: the parties shall file, by October 19, 2018, a joint status report with a proposed schedule for dispositive motions. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/24/2018. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-1930STATUS REPORT , jointly filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22ORDER, This Court is without authority to waive Judge Mauskopf's requirement that a motion for summary judgment be preceded by a request for a premotion conference. Therefore, absent a contrary order from Judge Mauskopf, defendants' request for a premotion conference before the District Court is due by November 7, 2018. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/22/2018. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-0731MOTION for pre motion conference by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-08ORDER: By November 22, 2018, plaintiff shall file a letter with the Court, not to exceed three pages, setting forth the legal and factual bases on which plaintiff intends to rely to oppose defendants' proposed motion for summary judgment. Upon receipt of this filing, the Court will further advise the parties as to whether a pre-motion conference is required. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/8/2018. (Pettig, Bruce) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-1232RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Douglas Cox. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
2018-12-2633Consent MOTION to Stay Pre-Motion Conference and/or Briefing by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-04ORDER re: 31 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; granting 33 Motion to Stay: The Court's grants the government's request to stay any pre-motion conference and briefing schedule during the lapse in appropriations. Counsel for the government shall notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated all necessary funds, and shall also confer with plaintiff's counsel to propose a new briefing schedule for any motions. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/4/2019. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-2834NOTICE by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence of Restoration of Appropriations (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-0135STATUS REPORT Proposing New Briefing Schedule by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-03-1536Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File For Summary Judgment, and to Set a Briefing Schedule by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-21ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties' joint proposed schedule is so-ordered. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/21/2019. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-1637Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Dispositive Motion by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-17ORDER: Defendants' motion for leave to file excess pages, on consent ( 37 ), is granted. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 4/17/2019. (Pettig, Bruce) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1938MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner (CIA), # 3 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann (DOJ), # 4 Declaration of David M. Hardy (FBI), # 5 Declaration of Deirdre Walsh (ODNI), # 6 Declaration of Mark H. Herrington (DOD), # 7 Declaration of Eric F. Stein (State), # 8 Exhibit 7 - January 16 2015 Letter from Sen. Feinstein, # 9 Rule 56.1 Statement) (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-1939NOTICE by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 56.2 (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-06-0440Letter MOTION for Sanctions for Preservation Violation by Douglas Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-05ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER re 40 Letter MOTION for Sanctions for Preservation Violation filed by Douglas Cox. This Court construes plaintiff's motion as a discovery motion within this Court's pretrial jurisdiction. Defendant Department of Defense must file its response by June 11, 2019. However, to the extent plaintiff ultimately requests spoliation sanctions, such a request is inextricably intertwined with the merits of the action and the pending summary judgment motion, and should be addressed to the District Judge in the first instance. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/5/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Proujansky, Josh). (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0741Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 Letter MOTION for Sanctions for Preservation Violation , Scheduling Order,, by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-07ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, on consent, 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' response to 40 Letter MOTION for Sanctions must be filed by June 14, 2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/7/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) Modified on 6/7/2019 (Proujansky, Josh). (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-1442MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 40 Letter MOTION for Sanctions for Preservation Violation filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark H. Herrington (2nd)) (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1843Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Dismiss and to Revise the Briefing Schedule by Douglas Cox. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-19ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time, on consent ( 43 ), is granted, subject to the following modification. The parties' initial proposed briefing schedule ( 36 ) did not comport with this Court's Individual Rule III.B.5, which requires that no motion papers be filed until the motion has been fully briefed. Accordingly, the filing at 38 is hereby terminated, and the parties are directed to adhere to the following schedule: by July 12, 2019, plaintiff shall serve but not file his opposition and any cross-motions; by August 20, 2019, defendants shall serve but not file their reply and opposition, if any; and by September 20, 2019, plaintiff shall serve his reply, if any, and file the fully briefed motion or motions on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 6/19/2019. (Pettig, Bruce) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-2144MOTION for Leave to File Document as a Reply to Defendants June 14, 2019, Opposition [Dkt. 42] by Douglas Cox. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21ELECTRONIC ORDER: Application 44 granted, without objection. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/21/2019. (Cardenas, Alex) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-2445REPLY in Support re 40 Letter MOTION for Sanctions for Preservation Violation filed by Douglas Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-0346NOTICE of Change of Address (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0847MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Terminating Motion for Sanctions 40 as moot. See attached for further discussion. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/8/2019. (Cardenas, Alex) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0948Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by Douglas Cox. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-10ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to file excess pages, on consent ( 48 ), is granted. Plaintiff's opposition memorandum shall not exceed 40 pages in length. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 7/10/2019. (Pettig, Bruce) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-08-1549Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-16ORDER: Defendants' motion for an extension of time, on consent ( 49 ), is granted. By October 18, 2019, defendants shall serve their reply and supplemental declaration; by November 22, 2019, plaintiff shall serve his sur-reply and file the fully briefed motions on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/16/2019. (Pettig, Bruce) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-10-1750Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-18ORDER: Defendants' request for leave to file excess pages ( 50 ), on consent, is granted. Defendants' reply shall not exceed 30 pages in length. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 10/18/2019. (Walchak, David) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-11-1951Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Douglas Cox. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-20ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to file excess pages, 51 , on consent, is granted. Plaintiff's sur-reply shall not exceed 15 pages in length. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/20/2019. (Walchak, David) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-2252Fully Briefed MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss on behalf of all parties by Douglas Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner (CIA), # 3 Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann (DOJ), # 4 Declaration of David M. Hardy (FBI), # 5 Declaration of Deirdre Walsh (ODNI), # 6 Declaration of Mark H. Herrington (DOD), # 7 Declaration of Eric F. Stein (State), # 8 Exhibit 7 - January 16, 2015 Letter from Sen. Feinstein, # 9 Rule 56.1 Statement, # 10 Plaintiff's Opposition, # 11 Exhibit A, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F, # 17 Exhibit G, # 18 Exhibit H, # 19 Exhibit I, # 20 Exhibit J, # 21 Exhibit K, # 22 Exhibit L, # 23 Exhibit M, # 24 Exhibit N, # 25 Exhibit O, # 26 Exhibit P, # 27 Exhibit Q, # 28 Exhibit R, # 29 Exhibit S, # 30 Exhibit T, # 31 Exhibit U, # 32 Exhibit V, # 33 Exhibit W, # 34 Exhibit X, # 35 Defendant's Reply, # 36 Combined Attachments, # 37 Plaintiff's Surreply, # 38 Exhibit A, # 39 Exhibit B, # 40 Exhibit C, # 41 Exhibit D) (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2020-11-3053MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Summary Judgment: For the reasons set forth herein, the Agencies motion to dismiss is denied, and the Agencies motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, DOJ is granted summary judgment with respect to their withholding of records in response to Coxs requests numbered five through eight; DOD is granted summary judgment with respect to their withholding of records in response to Cox's requests numbered five through seven; ODNI is granted summary judgment with respect to their withholding of records in response to Cox's requests numbered four and five; and the State Department is granted summary judgment with respect to their withholding of records in response to Cox's requests numbered four through six. The FBI's motion for summary judgment is denied without prejudice, and it is directed to supplement its Vaughn submissions in accordance with this Order. This matter is recommitted to Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all remaining pre-trial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/26/2020. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-02SCHEDULING ORDER: Chief Judge Mauskopf has ruled on the various dispositive motions and has returned the matter to this magistrate judge for renewed pretrial supervision. Counsel are directed to confer and to file, by December 8, 2020, a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings in the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/2/2020. (GM) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-0854STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule, Filed Jointly by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-11ORDER: The parties' joint proposed schedule at 54 is adopted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/11/2020. (GM) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-1455Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State of the United States, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-15ORDER: By December 21, 2020, plaintiff shall file a letter with the Court, not to exceed three pages, setting forth the legal and factual bases on which plaintiff intends to rely to oppose defendants' proposed motion for summary judgment. Upon receipt of this filing, the Court will further advise the parties as to whether a pre-motion conference is required. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/15/2020. (Prather, Lucy) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-2156RESPONSE to Motion re 55 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Douglas Cox. (Cox, Douglas) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-22Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference, 55 , is denied. Defendants shall serve their motion for summary judgment by February 4, 2021; Plaintiff shall serve a Rule 56(d) motion and/or an opposition by March 5, 2021; Defendants shall serve an opposition to the 56(d) and/or a reply by March 26, 2021; Plaintiff shall serve his reply, if any, and file the fully-briefed motion on or before April 16, 2021. The parties shall mail courtesy copies to chambers at time of filing. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/22/2020. (Prather, Lucy) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar