Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01064
Date Filed2017-06-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning settlements with corporate defendants that required contributions to La Raza, the Urban League, or the National Community Reinvestment Coalition. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Civil Division told Judicial Watch that it did not have any records, but after hearing nothing further from the other agency components, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4976621) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (jd) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-064STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 6, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/12/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/12/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/12/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-07-126NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-127ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-268PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) Modified event title on 7/27/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 31, 2017, a further Joint Status Report informing the Court (1) whether all claims have been resolved, and, if not, (2) proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 27, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2017. (tg) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-309Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 31, 2017, a further Joint Status Report informing the Court (1) whether all claims have been resolved, and, if not, (2) proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 31, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2017. (mac) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-10-3110Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by February 28, 2018, a further Joint Status Report informing the Court (1) whether all claims have been resolved, and, if not, (2) proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 31, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff