Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01078
Date Filed2017-06-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the Veterans Affairs Greater Los Angeles Healthcare System. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4979029) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Veterans' Affairs)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-07Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sb) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-164NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/12/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/12/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS served on 6/14/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-066ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are 1 a complaint and 6 an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/6/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/21/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-217Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of 7 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall continue searching for, reviewing, and releasing responsive records to Plaintiff on a rolling basis. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or by September 19, 2017 informing the Court of the status of Defendant's response. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2017 (hs) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-09-198Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-21MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report it is ORDERED that the Defendant shall continue making rolling productions to Plaintiff and that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on December 18, 2017 updating the Court on the status of production and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/21/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-12-189Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 the parties' joint status report, the parties are hereby directed to file another joint status report by February 7, 2018. The status report shall propose a definitive date for completing production and, if necessary, a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Defendant is also directed to continue making rolling production to Plaintiff on a monthly basis, with productions due January 8, 2018 and February 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/22/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
2017-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2017-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 1/8/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 12/27/2017)
2018-02-0710Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall complete its releases to plaintiff by June 30, 2018. The parties shall file a joint status report by April 20, 2018 updating the Court on the status of production. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/13/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-04-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall complete its releases to Plaintiff by July 30, 2018. The parties are directed to file a further joint status report by August 29, 2018 informing the Court whether any disputes remain and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/24/2018. (lccrc2) Modified on 4/24/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-07-2712MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS' AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Motion to Modify Production Schedule and vacating scheduling order entered on April 24, 2018. Defendant shall now complete its releases by November 30, 2018. The parties shall now file a joint status report by December 28, 2018 informing the Court whether any disputes remain and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/30/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar