Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAWRENCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01132
Date Filed2017-06-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffDARYL LAWRENCE
Case DescriptionLawrence, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning his conviction for murder. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency reviewed 1,573 pages, disclosing 841 pages with redactions and withholding 732 pages. Lawrence filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. Lawrence then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7 - Law enforcement records

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-09Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/9/17. (sth) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-091COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by DARYL LAWRENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sth) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-092MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DARYL LAWRENCE (sth) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-233PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/21/17. (sth) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-074NOTICE of voluntary withdrawal of complaint by DARYL LAWRENCE (sth) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff