Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCox v. Executive Office of US Attorneys et al
DistrictSouthern District of Illinois
CityEast St. Louis
Case Number3:2017cv00611
Date Filed2017-06-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David R. Herndon
PlaintiffFrancis Schaeffer Cox
Case DescriptionFrancis Cox, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys and other components of the Justice Department for records concerning himself. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but Cox was dissatisfied with their responses or lack thereof and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantExecutive Office of US Attorneys
DefendantBureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-091Notice of Case Opening. Judge David R. Herndon and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 17-611-DRH-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (kdb) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-092COMPLAINT against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms, Executive Office of US Attorneys, and Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Francis Schaeffer Cox.(kdb) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-14Filing fee: $ 401.23, receipt number 44625007963 (kdb) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-09-133NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL for failure to effect service against defendants. Action by plaintiff due by 10/13/2017. (arf) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-294MOTION for Extension of Time for Service Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3), (m) pursuant to doc 3 and MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Francis Schaeffer Cox. (kdb) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-11-155ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 4 Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail plaintiff three blank USM-285 forms. Plaintiff shall complete and return those forms to the Clerk no later than January 2, 2018, at which time the Clerk will issue summons. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 11/15/2017. (lmp) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-12-066Summons Issued as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms, Executive Office of US Attorneys, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (trb) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2018-01-047ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to complete, on Plaintiffs behalf, a summons for service of process on the United States; the Clerk shall issue the completed summons. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i), the Clerk shall (1) personally deliver to or send by registered or certified mail addressed to the civil-process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Illinois a copy of the summons, the complaint, and this Memorandum and Order; and (2) send by registered or certified mail to the Attorney General of the United States at Washington, D.C., a copy of the summons, the complaint, and this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/4/2018. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-01-058Summons Issued as to USA.(trb) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-129RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED 01/9/18. (kdb) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-01-1610RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED on 01/08/18. (kdb) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff