Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01137
Date Filed2017-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffNATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Case DescriptionThe National Women's Law Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning sexual harassment complaints pending before the agency's Office for Civil Rights. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the National Women's Law Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-121COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4985940) filed by NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibits A-B, # 3 Summons Dept. of Education, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Shoemaker, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-12Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-133NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Shoemaker on behalf of NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Shoemaker, Adam) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-234NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-07-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2017. (Shoemaker, Adam) Modified service and answer dates on 7/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/14/2017. (Shoemaker, Adam) Modified service date on 7/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 6/14/2017 (Shoemaker, Adam) Modified service date on 7/12/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/15/2017, (znmw) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-178ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-189ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff on or before August 17, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/18/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff