Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01147
Date Filed2017-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning interviews of Tom Blanoff during the investigation of former Illinois Gov. Rod Blagojevich. The agency told Judicial Watch that because third-party privacy interests were present it would not process the request without a showing of public interest. The FBI concluded that Judicial Watch had not shown a public interest in disclosure of the records. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4987589) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S.Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. DOJ)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-12Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/19/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/19/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-195NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-196ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-197STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than August 3, 2017. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Or Each Partys' Individual Recommendations due by 8/3/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff