Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01197
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2017-07-14
JudgeJudge Cathy Ann Bencivengo
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the final determination of a named individual's tribal application. The agency disclosed 38 partially redacted documents. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 civil cover sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1197-CAB-JMA. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case.(jpp) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (jpp) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-143ORDER denying 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff