Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReyes v. Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2017cv01194
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2017-07-14
JudgeJudge Cathy Ann Bencivengo
PlaintiffEmilio Reyes
Case DescriptionEmilio Reyes submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Indian Affairs, Southern California Agency for records concerning the tribal affiliation of a named individual. The agency withheld 31 documents in full and 12 documents in part. Reyes then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs Southern California Agency, IFP Filed, filed by Emilio Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:17-cv-1194-CAB-BGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(rlu) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Emilio Reyes. (rlu) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-143ORDER denying 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff