Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01149
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a section in Secretary of the Interior Ryan Zinke's Secretarial Order 3349 that pertained to waste prevention, production subject to royalties, and resource conservation. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4988556) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura H. King, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4852. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4988615. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-133LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sb) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 6/19/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Laura H. King is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Pro hac applicants who seek admission more than twice within two years are highly encouraged to become members of the Bar for this court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-068NOTICE of Appearance by Laura H. King on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (King, Laura) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-199NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1910Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to August 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/20/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-1811Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-19MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Joint Motion to Stay. This action is hereby STAYED until November 16, 2017, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report (along with a proposed order) to apprise the Court of the status of this proceeding. Either party may move to lift this stay during the pendency of the stay or any court-approved extensions thereof. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/19/17. (DJS) (Entered: 08/19/2017)
2017-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a joint report, along with a proposed order, to apprise the Court of the status of this proceeding by 11/16/2017. (jth) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-09-18Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1812MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shannon Laun, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 1402 Third Avenue, Suite 1022, Seattle, WA 98101. Phone No. - (206) 487-7225. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5121316. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-26MINUTE ORDER: Granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Shannon I. Laun is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/26/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2613NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon I. Laun on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Laun, Shannon) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-11-1414Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 11/16/2017, that the case is stayed until February 14, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by February 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/20/2017. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2018-02-0715Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is stayed until April 30, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/9/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-04-2316Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is stayed until May 31, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by May 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/23/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2417NOTICE of Change of Address by John R. Mellgren (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-2118Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is stayed until August 3, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/22/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-2919NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Shannon I. Laun terminated. (Laun, Shannon) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-07-2720Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall files its application for attorney's fees and costs by September 25, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/30/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-09-2421Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its application for attorney's fees and costs by October 25, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/25/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-1822Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its application for attorney's fees and costs by November 20, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/19/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's application for attorney's fees and costs due by 11/20/2018. (jl) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar