Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01151
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date Closed2017-10-31
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Surface Mining for records concerning a section in Secretary of the Interior Ryan Zinke's Secretarial Order 3349 requiring agency components to report on regulatory burdens. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4988709) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura H. King, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4852. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4988807. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-133LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-13Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LAURA HELEN KING. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/13/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-135NOTICE of Appearance by Laura H. King on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (King, Laura) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(King, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(King, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-218RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 6/19/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(King, Laura) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-07-189NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of All Defendants (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 18, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/18/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/18/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-08-1711Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-17MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 25, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/17/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/25/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-2412Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-24MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 22, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/24/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/22/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-2013ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, by October 4, 2017, the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/20/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 10/4/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-10-0314Consent MOTION to Stay re Set/Reset Deadlines, Order by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 14 Consent Motion, the Court ORDERS that: 1) the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before November 1, 2017; and 2) they shall submit a Joint Status Report by that date. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/3/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule and Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-3115STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
2017-10-31MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 15 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/31/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff