Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS et al v. ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01153
Date Filed2017-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
PlaintiffKOOTENAI ENVIRONMENTAL ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians and Kootenai Environmental Alliance submitted four FOIA requests to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning the lethal control of coyotes, bears, and wolves. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and made partial responses to several of them. However, after the agency failed to provide substantive responses to any of the requests, WildEarth Guardians and Kootenai Environmental Alliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4988923) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, KOOTENAI ENVIRONMENTAL ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-132MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew K. Bishop, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - (406) 324-8011. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4989007. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KOOTENAI ENVIRONMENTAL ALLIANCE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-133LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-134LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KOOTENAI ENVIRONMENTAL ALLIANCE (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-13Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-145SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-28MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Matthew Bishop is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/28/2017. (lckbj3) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-286NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K. Bishop on behalf of KOOTENAI ENVIRONMENTAL ALLIANCE, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Bishop, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Bishop, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Bishop, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE served on 7/12/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing, # 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts)(Bishop, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1910ANSWER to Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Pending before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before 8/2/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/19/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff