Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01155
Date Filed2017-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT
Case DescriptionWhite Coat Waste Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the care and use of dogs at laboratories at McGuire Veterans Affairs Medical Center. The agency disclosed records with personally-identifying information, including that of vendors, redacted under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(F) (harm to any person). WCWP filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, White Coat Waste Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4989815) filed by White Coat Waste Project. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to US Department of Veterans Affairs, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-142LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by White Coat Waste Project (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-14Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-294NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/26/2017. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-186Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 6 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than August 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 19, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Or Otherwise Response due by 8/28/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-197STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-08-288ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-29MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than September 27, 2017. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 29, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 9/27/2017. (mac) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-09-149PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,,,, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-10-04MINUTE ORDER. In view of 9 the parties' joint motion, the parties are directed to comply with the following schedule: defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than October 16, 2017; plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than November 17, 2017; defendant's reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion shall be filed by no later than December 4, 2017; and plaintiff's reply in support of its motion shall be filed by no later than December 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 4, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 10/16/2017. Plaintiff's Combined Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 11/17/2017. Defendant's Reply And Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 12/4/2017. Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion due by 12/22/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-1610MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Vaughn Index, # 4 Declaration Michael Fallon, # 5 Declaration Emily Fuemmeller, # 6 Declaration William Maragos)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-1611ERRATA Exhibit added in proper PDF Form by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-11-07MINUTE ORDER. The Court, sua sponte, directs the parties to show cause why this action should not be consolidated with White Coat Waste Project v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Civil Action No. 17-2264, by no later than November 17, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) (permitting the court to consolidate actions "involv[ing] a common question of law or fact"); Local Civ. R. 40.5(a)(3) (defining related civil actions). The briefing schedule for defendant's motion for summary judgment is hereby STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 7, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Show Cause due by 11/17/2017. (mac) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
2017-11-1712RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT re Order,, . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Strugar in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-20MINUTE ORDER. In view of 12 plaintiff's response to the Court's order to show cause as to why this case should not be consolidated with Civil Action No. 17-2264, the Court declines to consolidate the cases. The parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than December 6, 2017; defendant's reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion shall be filed by no later than December 22, 2017; and plaintiff's reply in support of its motion shall be filed by no later than January 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 20, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Combined Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/6/2017. Defendant's Reply And Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 12/22/2017. Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion due by 1/12/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2017-12-0613Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Declaration of Justin Goodman in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Declaration of Matthew Strugar in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-0614RESPONSE re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-1915Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-20MINUTE ORDER granting 15 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time. Defendant is directed to file its combined reply and opposition to plaintiff's motion by no later than January 29, 2018. Plaintiff is directed to file its reply in support of its motion by no later than March 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 20, 2017.(lcegs2) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2017-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Combined Reply And Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion due by 1/29/2018. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of Its Motion due by 3/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-2916REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
2018-03-0117REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-08MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.3(a)(3), the Court hereby refers 10 , 13 the parties' pending cross-motions for summary judgment to a magistrate judge for a report and recommendation. All proceedings before the Honorable Emmet G. Sullivan are hereby STAYED pending receipt of a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 8, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08Case Stayed (mac) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-08CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for a report and recommendation. (jd) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar