Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01160
Date Filed2017-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the agency's decision to deny a petition submitted by WildEarth Guardians to review its oil and gas leasing program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-141COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4991146) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BLM, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-15Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-07-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/26/2017. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-265NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-266ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-037ORDER directing the Government to produce a Vaughn Index with a supporting motion to dismiss or summary judgment, as appropriate by 9/4/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/2/17. (lsj) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-09-058Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-10-059STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-11-1410STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Royce C. Lamberth is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 Defendant's Status Report, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 15, 2017. (JPF) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2018-01-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-17MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposal in their 11 Joint Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report, with a proposed briefing schedule if necessary, on or before February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 17, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff