Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01161
Date Filed2017-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to five state offices of the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a 2016 lawsuit filed by Western Energy Alliance against the agency. The regional offices acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-141COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4991232) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BLM, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-14Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-07-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/26/2017. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-265ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/3/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/17/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-176Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-247NOTICE of Joint Proposed Schedule by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Notice of Joint Proposed Schedule, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before December 15, 2017 addressing the production of responsive records and the briefing schedule for dispositive motions. It is further ORDERED that 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/25/2017. (lccrc1) Modified to include deadline on 8/25/2017 (zlsj). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2017 (zlsj) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-12-158Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by January 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/18/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff