Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01170
Date Filed2017-06-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Campaign Legal Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning its decision to reverse the Obama administration's decision to phase out the use of private prisons. CLC also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency granted CLC's request for expedited processing, but after the agency failed to provide any substantive response to the request, the Campaign Legal Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4992154) filed by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons as to Attorney General, # 7 Summons as to Department of Justice, # 8 Summons as to U.S. Attorney)(Smith, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-153Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-154NOTICE of Appearance by Adav Noti on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-155NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Gaber on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/19/2017 (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017. (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2017. (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-149NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-1910ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Orloff, Serena) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-1911STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than August 3, 2017. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (4)Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order Or Each Party's Individual Recommendation due by 8/3/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff