Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01175
Date Filed2017-06-15
Date Closed2017-07-26
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffGANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC
doing business as USA TODAY
PlaintiffBRAD HEATH
doing business as USA TODAY
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffLACHLAN MARKAY
PlaintiffGARRETT GRAFF
Case DescriptionGannett Satellite News, publisher of USA Today. and reporter Brad Heath submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning conversations between former FBI Director James Comey and President Trump. Heath also asked for expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency granted USA Today's request for expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gannett Satellite News and Heath filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4992876) filed by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, BRAD HEATH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC. (md) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/20/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DOJ receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/20/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-107NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-148MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, BRAD HEATH (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/19/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-199AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC, BRAD HEATH, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, LACHLAN MARKAY, GARR GRAFF.(jf) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-2510Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-2611Case directly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg by consent. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Cases Consolidated Gannett Satellite Information Network LLC v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1175; Judicial Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1189; and Freedom Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1212. ALL FILINGS IN THESE CONSOLIDATED CASES SHALL ONLY BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 17-1167, pursuant to Minute Order filed 7/26/17. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(td) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff