Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01189
Date Filed2017-06-16
Date Closed2017-07-26
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning conversations between former FBI Director James Comey and President Trump. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
AppealD.C. Circuit 18-5042
AppealD.C. Circuit 18-5078
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4994706) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-162LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/23/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/23/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/23/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/23/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-265GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/26/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-106NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-207ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA suit are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before 8/3/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/20/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-258Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-269Case directly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg by consent. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Cases Consolidated Gannett Satellite Information Network LLC v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1175; Judicial Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1189; and Freedom Watch, Inc., v. Department of Justice, No. 17-1212. ALL FILINGS IN THESE CONSOLIDATED CASES SHALL ONLY BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 17-1167, pursuant to Minute Order filed 7/26/17. The parties are advised NOT to elect to SPREAD text when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails.(td) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar