Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2017cv04558
Date Filed2017-06-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Paul Oetken
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning notes and memos memorializing former FBI Director James Comey's conversations with President Trump. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-161COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13794383)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-163RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Finaciero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-164REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-165NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian MacDougall on behalf of Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (MacDougall, Ian) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (kl) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (kl) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Case Designated ECF. (kl) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-196ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (kl) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-267NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeannette Anne Vargas on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-248ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-279ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 11, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/11/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/27/2017) (ama) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-0810LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from David E. McCraw dated August 8, 2017 re: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0811MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 10 Letter filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The FBI's motion for summary judgment is due on October 13, 2017. The Times' opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is due on November 3, 2017. The FBI's reply and opposition is due on November 17, 2017. The Times' reply is due on December 1, 2017. The conference scheduled for August 11, 2017, is hereby adjourned. ( Cross Motions due by 11/3/2017., Motions due by 10/13/2017., Responses due by 11/17/2017, Replies due by 12/1/2017.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/8/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-10-0512MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT, as of September 18, 2017, Ian MacDougall is no longer with the Legal Department of The New York Times Company and hereby withdrawn his appearance as counsel for Plaintiffs The New York Time Company and Charlie Savage in the above-captioned litigation and requests that his name be removed from the Court's and the parties' service lists. Davie E. McGraw continues to serve as Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs, and all future correspondence and papers in this action should continue to be directed to him. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., Attorney Ian MacDougall terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/05/2017) (ama) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
2017-10-1313MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 11/3/2017(Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1314MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1315DECLARATION of David M. Hardy in Support re: 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-1316NOTICE of Filing of Ex Parte, In Camera Declaration re: 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-11-0317CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-0318MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-0319DECLARATION of David E. McCraw in Support re: 17 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-1720MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in further support of the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-1721DECLARATION of David Hardy in Opposition re: 17 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Vargas, Jeannette) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-12-0122REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff