Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRICHARDSON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01181
Date Filed2017-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffBOBBY RICHARDSON
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-12Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/12/17. (sth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-121COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by BOBBY RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit)(sth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-122MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BOBBY RICHARDSON (sth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-123PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by BOBBY RICHARDSON (sth) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-234ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $41.00 from Prison Account of Bobby Richardson and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/23/17. (sth) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-28Case Reassigned to Judge John D. Bates. Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (sth) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/25/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/24/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/26/2017 (td) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-016NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF served on 8/8/17 (td) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF served on 8/8/2017 (zrdj) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-119MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1110CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint . (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to September 25, 2017, to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/31/17.(ah) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to the complaint is now due by 9/25/2017. (jth) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-2511ANSWER to 1 Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2512MOTION for Scheduling Order for Briefing by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-27MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that 12 Defendants' Motion for a Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. The parties shall adhere to the following deadlines. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on or before November 3, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before December 8, 2017; Defendants' Reply is due on or before December 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/27/17.(ah) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 11/3/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/8/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/20/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
2017-10-0313LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Request for Admission "Leave to file DENIED. Discovery materials do not get filed with the court L.Cv.R. 5.2" This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/3/17. (td) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-1614RULE 26 STATEMENT by Plaintiff Bobby Richardson (td) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/19/2017) (ztd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2017: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (ztd). (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-11-0315MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration ATF Chisholm Declaration with Exhibits, # 4 Declaration USAO-EDVA Helms Declaration, # 5 Declaration EOUSA Jolly Declaration with Exhibits, # 6 Exhibit ATF Vaughn Index)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-0316MOTION for Order to take depositions by written questions by BOBBY RICHARDSON; "Let this be filed as a Motion to take depositions by written questions" by Judge John D. Bates (td) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-0617ORDER denying 16 plaintiff's construed motion for an order compelling discovery and staying all discovery; informing plaintiff of his obligation to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment by the December 8, 2017 deadline set in the previously issued scheduling order (see written order for details). Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/6/17.(ah) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-12-1118Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BOBBY RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O)(td) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2017-12-1919MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION/PRIVACY STAFF, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-19MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to January 17, 2018, to File Reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/19/17.(ah) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2017-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 1/17/2018. (tb) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff